+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, JDC.
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor