+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kidani, Slom.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 545).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-14-15.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1611) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1201) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-23-15 2:30PM in conference room 325.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-15.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-15 2:30PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-15.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 215) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 614) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Slom.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-27-15 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-25-15 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.