+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.