+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-23-16 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, EDN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 211) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 636) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 1:15PM in conference room CR414.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor