+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- The conference committee deferred the measure.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:45PM in conference room 229.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 12:45PM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 4:15PM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 3:00PM in conference room 229.
- Senator(s) Espero replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ige, Hee, Co-Chair(s); Green, Slom.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Carroll, Har, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Fukumoto.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 551).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1506) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1140) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla, McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Jordan.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-12-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 211) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 718) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 01-29-13 1:30PM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor