+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 68) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2599) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2039) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Inouye.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-18 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.