+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 5, 2023 in the House:
- Act 197, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1300).
On July 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Act 197, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1300).
On May 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 24) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 24).
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keohokalole, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2023 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Nakashima, Sayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Pierick.
On April 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 829).
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229.
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Kong, Sayama, Pierick.
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Keohokalole, Rhoads Co-Chairs.
On April 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 553).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557).
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1878), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Onishi.
On March 24, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1232) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1).
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, La Chica, Lamosao, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Kong.
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 03-14-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to TOU, CPC, referral sheet 17
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 269) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-07-23.
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 569) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 12:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, CPN/JDC.
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor