+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 205) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 695) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Nishihara, Slom.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-04-15 10:10AM in conference room 229.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-27-15 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-25-15 9:45AM in conference room 229.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 393) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-15 1:45PM in conference room 414.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/PSM, CPN.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.