+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 251) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1030) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 531) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:30PM in conference room 224.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
- Re-Referred to LCA, WAM.
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor