+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 150) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.