+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-22-17 9:25AM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-17 10:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 336) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 3:05PM in conference room 224.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor