+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Act 055, on 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 055, 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1).
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 75).
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 75) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-21 10:00AM; CR 309.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808).
- House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Sayama Co-Chairs; Okimoto.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Acasio, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Fevella.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 532).
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1833), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-07-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1211) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 276) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 959) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-09-21.
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LCA/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 476) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA/HMS, WAM.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor