+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 810).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Matsumoto.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 752).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Quinlan, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2170) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Kong, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1675) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 246) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Ihara, Kim, Moriwaki, Wakai. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1122) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 605) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor