+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-13-13 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 1:20PM in conference room 414.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor