+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TRE/PSM/JDL, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
- The committee on TRA deferred the measure.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRA/PSM, JDL/WAM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor