+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 296) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.