+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 246) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDL.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.