+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPN, JDL.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRA/CPN, JDL.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.