+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 7, 2021 in the House:
- Act 215, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 215, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1).
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 47) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 47).
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Rhoads, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-21 1:30PM in conference room CR 229.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 1:30PM; CR 229.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 1:30PM; CR 229.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808).
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Ichiyama Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Matsumoto.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Chang.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 466).
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1792), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-30-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1395) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-18-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 21
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 112) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-21.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 683) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 114) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, JDC.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor