+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-17-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 256) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 641) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:35AM in conference room 211.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 78) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.