+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.