+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EGH/WTL/WAM.
- Recommitted to EGH/WTL.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 02-19-13.
- Reported from EGH/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 435) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Wakai.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH/WTL will hold a public decision making on 02-14-13 1:18PM in conference room 225.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
- The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-13 2:50PM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EGH/WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.