+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1105) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:15AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 261) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 783) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 211) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, WAM.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.