+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1166) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 03-17-17 9:15AM in House conference room 329.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 253) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 734) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH/WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 19) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH/WAM.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS, CPH/WAM.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-17 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.