+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 670).
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kidani, Nishihara.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:15AM in conference room 016.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 11:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 11:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-15 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
- House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Brower, McDermott.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kidani, Taniguchi.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 536).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kawakami, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Pouha, Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1644) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: DeCoite, Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Tokioka.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, LoPresti, Oshiro, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1219) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-25-15 2:40PM in conference room 325.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-25-15.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-23-15 2:45PM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 190) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 579) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Nishihara.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor