+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 188) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 621) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-25-15 9:45AM in conference room 229.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 213) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-10-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 2:30PM in conference room 414.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HTH, CPN.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/CPN.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor