+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WLA/HEA/EET, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/HEA/ENE, WAM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor