+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to JHA/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Lee). Transmitted to House.
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 10) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 273) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 02-15-23.
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki.
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-09-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 13) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/HWN, WAM.
On January 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor