+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on TRA deferred the measure.
- The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN/TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN/TRA.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor