+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 3:30PM in conference room 414.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.