+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.