+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM/WAM.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to PSM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to PSM.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM will hold a public decision making on 02-05-15 1:16PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor