+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor