+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
- Reported from HOU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 517) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 1:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU/GVO, JDC.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.