+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 251) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 3:35PM in conference room 224.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor