+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 2:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/ENE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.