+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-21-13 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AGL/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 73) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom.
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.