+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, JDC.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.