+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 037, 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Act 037, on 06/07/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 840).
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Johanson, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Kong, Okimoto.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-15-21 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-19-21.
- One Day Notice 04-19-21.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 528).
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1866) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1485) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JHA.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-30-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 983) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Belatti.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-12-21 11:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to ECD, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 19
- Pass First Reading
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 60) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-24-21.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 595) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor