+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1301) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 03-17-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 241) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 728) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 55) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-17 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor