+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 423.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 3:35PM in Conference Room 423.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Added: Senator Baker added as Co-Chair.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 691).
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-20-17 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Nishihara, Tokuda, L. Thielen Co-Chairs.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Luke Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Matsumoto.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677).
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 565).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Har, Holt, LoPresti, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Nakamura, Oshiro, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ing, Kobayashi, C. Lee, Quinlan, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1764) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-17.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Choy, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola, Ward; and Excused: none.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Ing, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, C. Lee, LoPresti, Lowen, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Quinlan, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1234) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 239) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Shimabukuro, Wakai.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ETT/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 395) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen.
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 1:35PM in conference room 414.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.