+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to JDC.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor