+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 3, 2023 in the House:
- Act 165, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).
On July 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Act 165, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).
On May 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
On April 28, 2023 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 129) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 129).
On April 28, 2023 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kitagawa, La Chica, Marten, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Rhoads, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:00PM; Conference Room 229.
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 4:31PM; Conference Room 229.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 229.
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 3:20PM; Conference Room 229.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 229.
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
On April 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; La Chica, Marten, Garcia.
On April 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Kanuha.
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915).
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 558).
On April 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1924), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1365) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Evslin, Kapela, La Chica, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, Quinlan.
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 17
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 32).
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 715) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-03-23.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 56) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, JDC.
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced and passed First Reading.
On January 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor