+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 108, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Act 108, on 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1208).
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 46) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 46).
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:00AM in conference room 312.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 10:00AM in conference room 312.
- Senator(s) Chun Oakland replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Takayama Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Ward.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 547).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1579) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1115), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 195).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 720) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 99) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 2:50PM in conference room 224.
- Re-Referred to PSM, WAM.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor