+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 28) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 9:00AM in conference room CR016.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.