+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from EGH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
- The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EGH/PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.