+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1530), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Yamane.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-19.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-18-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1356) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 217) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 723) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 92) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor