+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2296) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Inouye.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-18 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor