+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 97) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor