+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Espero, Gabbard, Ihara.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 532).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Ichiyama, Johanson, Jordan, Kawakami, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Pouha, Tokioka, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Cullen, Har, Kong, McDermott, Tupola, Ward, Yamane voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1658), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Pouha; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308.
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tsuji, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from HLT/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1233) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, Woodson, McDermott.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/JUD on Wednesday, 03-25-15 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 32
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 177) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kidani, Kouchi . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 686) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-15 9:05AM in conference room 016.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 414.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor